OMNOM GROUP LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Omnom is a new high-street food and well being concept that promotes conscious living and social responsibility. For every meal served at Omnom, a hot, healthy, nutritionally balanced meal will be served in the developing world providing relief from poverty on a sustainable basis. Within the unit will also be a mindfulness and yoga space offering physical health and emotional wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Islington
- India
Governance
- 08 November 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yuvraj Rana | Chair | 23 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Nitin Madhavji | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
AJAY KUMAR | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.07k | £326.52k | £289.82k | £521.07k | £254.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.12k | £421.07k | £330.35k | £555.14k | £253.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.16k | £94.14k | £18.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £222.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £280.71k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £555.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 31 August 2022 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
4. THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS (THE “OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: • FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, INDIA AND SUCH OTHER AREAS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE: - THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, INCLUDING THOUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, FINANCIAL SUPPORT, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT AND/OR RELIEVE POVERTY; AND - THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF NUTRITION AND MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELL-BEING, AND THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, FINANCIAL SUPPORT, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PROMOTE NUTRITION AND/OR WELL-BEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Omnom Group Limited
21 Brinkburn Gardens
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 5PL
- Phone:
- 07903941326
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window