THE SISTERS OF THE DIVINE SAVIOUR CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes in furtherance of the Roman Catholic Religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 05 September 2017: CIO registration
- 14 October 2019: Funds received from 228082 THE SISTERS OF THE DIVINE SAVIOUR
- SISTERS OF THE DIVINE SAVIOUR (Working name)
- THE SALVATORIAN SISTERS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SR PAULA LANGTON | Chair | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sister Saliamma Joseph | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARIA GORETTI | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev GRETA ANN FREEMAN | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.28k | £30.15k | £27.49k | £29.28k | £47.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.75k | £95.13k | £98.88k | £86.09k | £73.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE MOTHER GENERAL SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SISTERS OF THE DIVINE SAVIOUR
THE DIVINE SAVIOUR CONVENT
DILLON COURT
NETHAM ROAD
BRISTOL
BS5 9PF
- Phone:
- 01179413774
- Email:
- paula.langton@virgin.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window