Trustees The Parochial Church Council of the ecclesiastical parish of Fen Drayton with Fenstanton
Charity number: 1173597

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Elizabeth Mackellar | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROSEMARY BLUNT | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hunt | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Susan Caroline Stevens | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Rosemary Tallowin | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|||||
PHILIP BLUNT | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|||||
JULIA JANE MITCHELL | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HOUSEGO | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LORRAINE ORBELL | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hyde | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE MARIA HUCKLESBY | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIKI WHITBY | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
GWEN TUCKER | Trustee | 03 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH PAGE | Trustee | 18 April 2013 |
|
|||||
IAN FRANCIS HUCKLESBY | Trustee | 21 April 2005 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.