THE GILBERT AND GEORGE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide facilities for the safe-keeping, conservation, storage and display to the public of works of art belonging to the CIO; make loans of works of art belonging to the CIO to other institutions in the UK and abroad; promote and carry out research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 04 October 2017: CIO registration
- 02 March 2020: Funds received from 1135781 THE GILBERT AND GEORGE CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ann Blackader Vallotton | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Jonathan Paget Fox | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE PASSMORE | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR RICHARD RILEY | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|||||
GILBERT PROUSCH | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ALAN CLOWTHER BRACEWELL | Trustee | 04 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.13k | £21.83k | £14.98k | £53.87k | £346.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.38k | £11.56k | £70.39k | £212.41k | £723.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 23 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, AND GENERALLY TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, ARCHITECTURE, HERITAGE AND CULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION AFTER THE DEATHS OF GEORGE PASSMORE AND GILBERT PROUSCH, OF THE PROPERTIES IN FOURNIER STREET OCCUPIED BY THEM AND THE COLLECTIONS, ARCHIVES AND WORKS OF ART CREATED BY THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 FOURNIER STREET
LONDON
E1 6QE
- Phone:
- 02072470161
- Website:
-
gilbertandgeorgecentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window