SITE GALLERY LTD.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FREE ACCESS TO VISUAL ART FOR ALL AND TO CREATE AN INNOVATIVE AND EXPLORATORY ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO EXPLORE VISUAL ART WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON LENS-BASED MEDIA. TO PROMOTE THE WORK OF ARTISTS AND FACILITATE CONTACT AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN ARTISTS AND THE PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,277 from 1 government contract(s) and £21,700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
92 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 15 August 1980: Standard registration
- Site Gallery Limited (Working name)
- SITE GALLERY (MEDIA, ART, PHOTOGRAPHY) LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Victoria Brindley | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Sian Davies | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Richard Londesborough | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rearden | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christie Elizabeth Rossiter | Trustee | 08 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Clare Wexford Campbell | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Silas Edward Hand | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dawn Hill | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Tillotson | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Powell | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Baxendale | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £812.28k | £735.07k | £612.11k | £646.60k | £497.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00m | £691.17k | £706.91k | £799.93k | £644.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.52k | £524.28k | £39.69k | £121.70k | £21.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £792 | £24 | £347 | £414 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £66.37k | £7.59k | £17.29k | £51.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £668.54k | £614.37k | £465.76k | £523.59k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £67.09k | £45.48k | £58.77k | £71.45k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £9.49k | £67.61k | £69.94k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £994.64k | £690.47k | £702.53k | £790.26k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £8.24k | £694 | £4.39k | £9.68k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.54k | £3.06k | £3.62k | £4.86k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £282 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 MAY 1980 AND CERTIFICATE UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 MAY 1995. as amended on 06 Mar 2020 as amended on 21 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
The Company is established to promote and advance and support the development and growth of the contemporary arts, in particular, but not exclusively visual arts, multi-media arts, performance art and moving image arts, through exhibitions, arts events, lectures and workshops and to champion diverse talent and to provide opportunities for people of all backgrounds to participate in the arts for the engagement with and benefit of the public.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SITE GALLERY (M A P) LTD
1 BROWN STREET
SHEFFIELD
S1 2BS
- Phone:
- 01142812077
- Email:
- info@sitegallery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window