Financial history BOLLINGTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1173917
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £16.55k £22.82k £11.15k £17.71k £16.31k
Total expenditure £9.66k £11.53k £20.42k £16.68k £21.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £19.37k N/A N/A N/A