JCCP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The JCCP has been established to provide information, support and reassurance to the general public seeking non-surgical aesthetic treatments via the operation of a Government PSA approved register of practitioners and a separate register of education and training providers. The JCCP also campaigns on critical issues affecting patient safety in the non-surgical sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 March 2018: Standard registration
- JCCP (Working name)
- JOINT COUNCIL FOR COSMETIC PRACTITIONERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor DAVID THOMAS SINES CBE PHD | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Brenda McKibbin | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Kiely | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Marie Brownlie | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Anne Cairns | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Underwood | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martyn Ian King | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN BALFOUR ELDER | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barry Charlson | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Rankin | Trustee | 17 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tracey Bell | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY MARGARET TABER | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAWN KNIGHT | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD HOOKER | Trustee | 14 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARY JOY LOVEGROVE OBE | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.62k | £32.81k | £61.83k | £106.61k | £113.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.40k | £33.21k | £61.50k | £68.73k | £98.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF, AND PROTECTION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE DEVELOPMENT AND PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF PRACTICE AMONG NON-SURGICAL COSMETIC PRACTITIONERS AND HAIR RESTORATION SURGEONS, INCLUDING BY (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 4.1.1 DEFINING, CREATING AND MAINTAINING AN EFFECTIVE STRUCTURE TO INFORM THE STANDARD OF PROFESSIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING AMONGST NON-SURGICAL COSMETIC PRACTITIONERS AND HAIR RESTORATION SURGEONS, INCLUDING MAINTAINING A REGISTER OF APPROVED EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROVIDERS; 4.1.2 WORKING WITH PROFESSIONAL REGULATED STATUTORY BODIES WHO ARE ENGAGED WITH NON-SURGICAL COSMETIC PRACTICE TO AGREE APPROPRIATE PROCESSES FOR JOINT WORKING WITH REGARD TO FITNESS TO PRACTICE AND REGISTRANT CONDUCT, INFORMED BY THE STANDARDS OF PRACTICE PROFICIENCY AND SAFE PRACTICE SET DOWN BY THE JCCP; 4.1.3 ADVANCING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF NON-SURGICAL COSMETIC INTERVENTIONS TO INFORM AND PROMOTE SAFE AND EFFECTIVE PRACTICE STANDARDS FOR THE PUBLIC; 4.1.4 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROMOTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE FIELD OF NON-SURGICAL COSMETIC AND HAIR RESTORATION TREATMENTS; 4.1.5 PROVIDING KNOWLEDGE AND ADVICE TO STAKEHOLDER BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS RESPONSIBLE FOR DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING CLINICAL AND PRACTICE BASED STANDARDS FOR NON-SURGICAL TREATMENTS TO ENSURE PUBLIC SAFETY; 4.1.6 REGULATION THROUGH THE MAINTENANCE A VOLUNTARY REGISTER OF PERSONS WHO ARE FIT TO PRACTICE AS NON-SURGICAL COSMETIC PRACTITIONERS AND HAIR RESTORATION SURGEONS, HAVING MET PRESCRIBED CRITERIA AND CONTINUING PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT REQUIREMENTS (REGISTRANTS); AND 4.1.7 PUBLISHING, OPERATING AND IMPLEMENTING A CODE OF PRACTICE FOR REGISTRANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF PUBLIC PROTECTION. 4.2 IN THESE ARTICLES, CHARITABLE MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE THAT IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARRANMORE
SAYES COURT FARM DRIVE
ADDLESTONE
KT15 1NB
- Phone:
- 07787002297
- Email:
- admin@jccp.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window