Accounts and annual returns JOHN MCQUARRIE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1175895
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 March 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 March 2021 51 days late
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 March 2021 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 28 March 2021 417 days late