Trustees TOPSHAM RUGBY FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1174681

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Cottle | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Oxland | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Robert Francis Deasy | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Philip David Dixie | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hawley | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Freyja Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Stewart | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mercedes Osborne | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Katie Sarah Lunnon | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ron Murray | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.