Financial history ASD HELPING HANDS

Charity Number: 1175729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £46.11k £19.91k £17.94k £114.13k £128.93k
Total expenditure £41.18k £14.64k £22.74k £88.32k £121.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £52.37k £107.24k
Income from government grants N/A £5.75k N/A N/A N/A