ASD HELPING HANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASD Helping Hands will support all service users affected by an Autistic Spectrum Disorder (ASD) regardless of age or what stage of life they are at. We aim to offer guidance, practical advice and support whether you are personally affected or you are an associated family member, carer, friend or professional through but not limited to advice services, face to face support, training and activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £107,235 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 14 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM BRYAN GASKIN | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMY LOUISE HILDA CULVERHOUSE | Trustee | 13 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ADCOCK | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.11k | £19.91k | £17.94k | £114.13k | £128.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.18k | £14.64k | £22.74k | £88.32k | £121.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.37k | £107.24k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 March 2022 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS IN NEED BY REASON OF AN AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER UNDIAGNOSED OR DIAGNOSED AND CO-MORBID CONDITIONS INCLUDING THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOLLOWING:- ·THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE; ·THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; ·THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AUTISTIC SPECTRUM DISORDER UNDIAGNOSED OR DIAGNOSED AND CO-MORBID CONDITIONS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SAID INDIVIDUALS; AND ·CO-OPERATING WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES WITH SIMILAR OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
A S D Helping Hands
Room 412-416
Breckland Business Centre
St. Withburga Lane
DEREHAM
NR19 1FD
- Phone:
- 01362 685860
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window