THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD SOUL WINNING CENTRE, NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious education, soul winning and evangelism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 18 July 2017: Standard registration
- RCCG SOUL WINNING CENTRE (Working name)
- RCCG SOUL WINNING CENTRE, NORWICH (Working name)
- RCCG SWC (Working name)
- RCCG SWC, NORWICH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard OLURANTI | Trustee | 15 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Eshe OLAWOLU | Trustee | 09 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ESTHER ANJORIN Deacon | Trustee | 11 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.04k | £10.57k | £21.61k | £18.37k | £28.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.62k | £4.28k | £16.73k | £16.45k | £25.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 October 2024 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE ("THE OBJECT"}
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 GLENMORE GARDENS
NORWICH
NR3 2RN
- Phone:
- 07984944407
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window