CALNE MEN'S SHED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Calne Men's Shed is part of the international Men's Shed movement aimed at providing a place where men /women of all races, creeds etc can meet for social and practical activities. We aim to have a range of workshop facilities and provide training and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 June 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Ann Morrow | Chair | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brand | Trustee | 10 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffery Richard Rawlings | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.01k | £9.69k | £2.77k | £2.51k | £10.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51k | £3.05k | £2.01k | £4.91k | £9.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.00k | £354 | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OLDER MEN, WITHIN THE CALNE COMMUNITY AREA AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, FROM BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THEY CAN MEET JOINTLY OR INDIVIDUALLY TO UNDERTAKE CREATIVE, PHYSICAL OR RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, LEARN OR PASS ON SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE AND SUPPORT EACH OTHER SOCIALLY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH(PHYSICAL OR MENTAL).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Groundsman's Building
Anchor Rd
Calne
SN11 8DT
- Phone:
- 07917002135
- Email:
- enquiries@calnemensshed.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window