Financial history GEMMA AND CHRIS MCGOUGH CHARITABLE FOUNDATION CIO

Charity number: 1173373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £13.77k £2.72k £3.25k £6.77k £5.66k
Total expenditure £102.05k £100.82k £161.49k £44.36k £89.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A