NEW BLAKELAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a range of social and educational activities for residents of the Blakelaw and surrounding areas. Blakelaw Neighbourhood Centre is a focal point for community activities and particuulary targets work with children and young people and the elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 02 October 1980: Standard registration
- 22 May 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.06k | £39.67k | £27.34k | £29.25k | £39.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.15k | £53.54k | £29.91k | £37.59k | £35.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 1980 AS AMENDED 27 AUGUST 1980 AND 18 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BLAKELAW (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIONS OR OTHER OPINION BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE SOCIAL EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
BLAKELAW
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window