Financial history KICKING OFF AGAINST CANCER

Charity Number: 1174092
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.77k £7.75k £10.60k £7.34k £5.35k
Total expenditure £27.43k £1.64k £8.21k £6.08k £4.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A