Accounts and annual returns HENDRED SPORTS CLUB

Charity number: 1180140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 09 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 31 July 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 31 July 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 28 September 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 28 September 2021 60 days late Download Open in new window