Accounts and annual returns THE ELSPETH J THOMPSON MEMORIAL TRUST (SLYNE WITH HEST CHURCH HALL)

Charity Number: 1175313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 12 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 November 2023 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 29 November 2023 302 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 March 2021 32 days late Download Open in new window