MOBILITY AND ACCESS GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a Minibus to take people with disabilities and the elderly shopping also social occasions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 05 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL CHAPMAN | Chair | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
June Rielly Booth | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pearl Pugh Coles | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Boughy Morrell | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Binder Pugh | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Barrett McGuinn Mrs | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.81k | £13.00k | £10.38k | £10.76k | £25.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.34k | £5.00k | £10.21k | £20.74k | £11.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.00k | £3.00k | £8.82k | £10.00k | £22.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 March 2022 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 April 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 05 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN HANDFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR OR DISABLED, PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE THERE ARE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES. 2)TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY OR WHO ARE ELDERLY IN HANDFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY A. OUTINGS AND SOCIAL TRIPS INCLUDING TRANSPORT TO AND FROM HOME; B. RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES OF POOR ACCESS FACED BY PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 37
Oakmere
Spath Lane
WILMSLOW
SK9 3NS
- Phone:
- 07899663436
- Email:
- bezchap1000@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window