GRACE EMPOWERMENT ASSEMBLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Sunday Church Service: which start with Sunday schoool for adult and children of all ages, the children have their class separate. - weekly Bilble study : which is digging deep and prayer meeting. - Every last Sunday of the month is Evangelism, going to the community to speak to people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 July 2017: Standard registration
- RCCG GLORY ASSEMBLY (Working name)
- THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD GLORY ASSEMBLY (Previous name)
- THE REDEEMED CHRSTIAN CHURCH OF GOD GLORY ASSEMBLY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MELANIE NJENUH LISINGE EKANI | Trustee | 14 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ESOHE PHILOMINA URUBUSI | Trustee | 14 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.53k | £7.40k | £5.52k | £10.73k | £10.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.51k | £2.58k | £13.00k | £6.13k | £6.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 01 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 MAY 2017 as amended on 25 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST WHICH IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Par Close
HERTFORD
SG13 7TL
- Phone:
- 07984413361
- Website:
-
WWW.GRACEEMPOWERMENTASSEMBLY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window