Accounts and annual returns SAGARMATHA GURKHA-NEPALESE COMMUNITY (ASHFORD KENT) CIO

Charity number: 1175315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 22 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 April 2024 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 April 2024 62 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window