GRACE BAPTIST CHURCH PORTSMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of Christian religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 03 July 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev EVAN RICHARDS | Chair | 23 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gribbin | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lui Jeet | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Goodspeed | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.66k | £65.26k | £90.46k | £52.99k | £48.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.88k | £55.27k | £76.83k | £59.75k | £59.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 207 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GRACE BAPTIST CHURCH
46 COPNOR ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO3 5AH
- Phone:
- 07922179274
- Email:
- EvanPTRichards@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window