Financial history TRAUMA TREATMENT INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1175429
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.14k £22.16k £103.43k £237.25k £168.07k
Total expenditure £46.21k £25.89k £75.16k £137.63k £205.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A