WYE GYMNASTICS AND GALAXY CHEERLEADING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities to participate in gymnastics, cheerleading and gymnastics-related activities for people in Monmouth and Newport. Particularly, but not exclusively, for children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £99,836 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2018: CIO registration
- GALAXY CHEERLEADING (Working name)
- WYE GYMNASTICS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Adams | Chair | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Choules | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Johnson | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMMA JANE DENT | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £209.54k | £217.32k | £231.71k | £310.44k | £439.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.86k | £223.33k | £235.89k | £294.53k | £388.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £88.38k | £11.27k | £5.93k | £99.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN GYMNASTICS, CHEERLEADING AND GYMNASTICS RELATED ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE IN MONMOUTHSHIRE AND NEWPORT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wyes up Centre
Unit 53e-53f
Symondscliffe Way
Severn Bridge Industrial Estate
Portskewett
CALDICOT
- Phone:
- 01291420001
- Email:
- mail@wyegymnastics.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window