NORTH LONDON SAMARITANS (INCORPORATING ENFIELD, HARINGEY AND BARNET SAMARITANS)

Charity Number: 1173621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a small charity, affiliated to the main Samaritans charity. We provide emotional support to the distressed and despairing in North London and beyond, by telephone, email and SMS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £50,605
Total expenditure: £61,429

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet
  • Enfield
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 April 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Amanda Jane Cerny Trustee 06 February 2023
None on record
Joanne Quittner Trustee 07 November 2022
None on record
Alison Scoltock Trustee 17 January 2022
None on record
John Henry Pyatt Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record
Natalie Floyde Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Lesley Ann Ryder-Davies Trustee 04 July 2020
None on record
Adam McCormack Trustee 11 September 2018
THE BROMLEY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £64.96k £71.04k £40.92k £45.61k £50.61k
Total expenditure £24.84k £59.46k £58.65k £59.71k £61.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £1.70k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/03/1976 AS AMENDED ON 29/10/2003 AS AMENDED ON 15/12/2006 AS AMENDED ON 16/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
1)TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN ENFIELD, HARINGEY AND BARNET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE REFERRAL TO PERSON HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS ; AND 2) TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGHS OF ENFIELD AND HARINGEY AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Registration history
  • 23 April 1976 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Shaftesbury Hall
Herbert Road
LONDON
N11 2QN
Phone:
02088886540