Accounts and annual returns QUR'AN HALAQAH

Charity number: 1175384
Charity reporting is up to date (218 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 February 2023 30 July 2024 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 February 2023 30 July 2024 218 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2021 31 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 October 2020 26 March 2022 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 October 2020 30 March 2022 217 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 25 April 2019 30 March 2021 399 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 April 2019 31 March 2021 400 days late Download Open in new window