QUR'AN HALAQAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Producing and/or distributing literature on the Qur'an to enlighten others about the Qur'an and the Islamic religion 2. Providing coaching and mentoring to support Muslim women and girls in their study of the Qur'an and the Islamic religion 3. Organising lectures and gatherings for Muslim women to discuss the Qur'an and the Islamic religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 25 February 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 October 2017: CIO registration
- QH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SELIAT AGBOOLA | Chair | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
KHUDEJA BEGUM | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
AZEEZAT AKANDE | Trustee | 26 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 25/04/2019 | 25/10/2020 | 25/10/2021 | 25/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.32k | £304 | £350 | £300 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.24k | £299 | £323 | £273 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 25 February 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 218 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 February 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 218 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 October 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 October 2020 | 26 March 2022 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 October 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 25 April 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 399 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 25 April 2019 | 31 March 2021 | 400 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY MUSLIM WOMEN IN THE UK, BY MEANS OF RAISING AWARENESS, PROVIDING INFORMATION AND OFFERING ADVICE ABOUT THE QUR'ANIC SCRIPTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 EVANDALE ROAD
LONDON
SW9 6SU
- Phone:
- 07956216838
- Email:
- salam@quranhalaqah.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window