Financial history THE CHOLDERTON ESTATE TRUST

Charity number: 1176973
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.52k £750 £3.00k £5.00k £5.34k
Total expenditure £1.11k £637 £1.00k £2.72k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A