Financial history SHEFFIELD CENTRAL DEAF CLUB

Charity Number: 510360
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £11.94k £12.04k £14.84k £7.63k £5.44k
Total expenditure £7.68k £11.25k £10.85k £8.12k £6.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £5.00k £5.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A £5.00k N/A N/A