CEFFYL DU RDA DRIVING GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO promotes the objects of the Riding for the Disabled Association incorporating Carriage Driving, a charity registered under charity number 244108 ("RDA"), by providing disabled people with the opportunity to carriage drive to benefit their health and well-being.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £250 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 June 2017: CIO registration
- 26 March 2019: Funds received from 1074334 CEFFYL DU CARRIAGE DRIVING FOR DISABLED GROUP
- CEFFYL DU RDA DRIVING GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA CHRISTINE WAITE | Chair | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rowan Smith | Trustee | 28 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bethanie Headworth | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELIZABETH BLAIR DASS, CQSW | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
HILARY FLORENCE LIPSCOMBE | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE DIANNE SUFF | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYN MARIE HORROCKS | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA SUSAN ELIZABETH SAY | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|||||
LAUREN KATE MOFFITT | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK LENNARD GIBBONS | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117 | £2.13k | £753 | £537 | £1.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.96k | £5.92k | £4.10k | £4.05k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £250 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Jun 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND /OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE S E WALES AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Broome Path
St. Dials
Cwmbran
NP44 4ND
- Phone:
- 07940744447
- Email:
- chair@ceffyldu-rda.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window