THE FRIENDS OF BRAMFIELD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold fundraising events to raise money which is used to enhance the school learning environment at Bramfield C of E Primary
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 01 August 2017: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF BRAMFIELD SCHOOL (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF BRAMFIELD SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shaun Bladen | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Denise Rush | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Shoote | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.01k | £2.87k | £14.35k | £27.03k | £22.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35k | £340 | £783 | £4.45k | £57.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £500 | £6.28k | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 October 2020 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AT BRAMFIELD CHURCH OF ENGLAND PRIMARY SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: PROVIDING RESOURCES AND FACILITIES BEYOND THOSE USUALLY EXPECTED OF A PRIMARY SCHOOL. RAISING AND PROVIDING FUNDS TO ENHANCE THE CHILDREN'S LEARNING ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bramfield C of E Primary School
Bridge Street
Bramfield
HALESWORTH
IP19 9HZ
- Phone:
- 01986784205
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window