KORE DEVELOPMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a community-driven charity in Brent, we empower residents by providing support in childcare, employment, mental health, and social development. Through holiday camps and training programmes, we help individuals gain confidence, develop skills, and secure opportunities. Our mission is to foster resilience, inclusion, and long-term stability for a thriving community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £39,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Brent
- Ealing
- Harrow
- Hertfordshire
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 27 November 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nike Akiti | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Mitchell | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theo Manderson | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allan McLeod | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ozu Okere | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Burke | Trustee | 04 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.53k | £0 | £0 | £9.02k | £58.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.53k | £0 | £0 | £3.92k | £43.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.95k | £39.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 August 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 August 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2019
(These accounts |
01 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Nov 2017 as amended on 01 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BY OFFERING RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION WITH 24 HOUR SUPPORT, MENTORING AND TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS, EMPLOYMENT READY TRAINING SKILLS, BUDGETING AND FINANCIAL EDUCATION IN THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS OF LONDON (E.G. BRENT).
Area of benefit
IN THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS OF LONDON (E.G. BRENT)
Contact information
- Address:
-
61A Bridge Street
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07935284520
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window