SOUTH WESTERN REGIONAL LIBRARY SERVICES CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We take a strategic & partnership approach to serving our communities by developing staff, services & resources that are inclusive, sustainable & enhance learning. We do this through 5 key areas of activity: networking; providing training & development opportunities & courses; providing grants for projects & training; facilitating the inter lending of resources; developing strategic partnerships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bournemouth
- Bristol City
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Gloucestershire
- Hampshire
- Somerset
- Torbay
- Wiltshire
- Guernsey
- Jersey
Governance
- 21 December 2017: CIO registration
- 02 November 2018: Funds received from 284072 THE SOUTH WESTERN REGIONAL LIBRARY SERVICE
- SWRLS (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kerry Kellaway | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Choules | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simonetta Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jane Tout | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Kristina Wellard | Trustee | 30 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Garfield Hosking | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chaloner | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jolanta Peters | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Donna Lynne Gundry | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Merryn Elizabeth Kent | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.37k | £41.65k | £20.13k | £52.40k | £52.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.76k | £28.38k | £26.79k | £46.19k | £46.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.83k | £26.29k | £13.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.95k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 Dec 2017 as amended on 09 Jun 2020 as amended on 26 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) PROMOTING CROSS SECTOR CO-OPERATION BETWEEN MEMBERS. (B) PROMOTING ACCESS TO LIBRARY COLLECTIONS AND SPECIALIST KNOWLEDGE. (C) PROVIDING A FRAMEWORK FOR THE INTERLENDING OF MATERIALS. (D) ADVANCING THE SKILLS AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE WORKFORCE AND THEIR STAKEHOLDERS. (E) FACILITATING A COLLABORATIVE NETWORK TO SHARE BEST PRACTICE AND EXCELLENCE. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LITERATURE, KNOWLEDGE AND LIFELONG LEARNING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING: (A) ACCESS TO SPECIALIST RESOURCES. (B) CULTURAL ACTIVITIES AND PARTNERSHIPS. (C) ACCESS TO DATA AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARTS UNIVERSITY PLYMOUTH
TAVISTOCK PLACE
PLYMOUTH
PL4 8AT
- Phone:
- 07590218156
- Email:
- coordinator@swrls.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window