Accounts and annual returns EAST OXFORD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1173991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 04 February 2025 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 January 2025 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required