ARCHBISHOP BECK PTA

Charity number: 1173648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The PTA of Archbishop Beck Catholic College aim to raise funds to support the college and it's students across all departments and activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023

Total income: £499
Total expenditure: £3,390

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 July 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Bailey Chair 01 September 2019
None on record
Janine O'Brien Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
MARION FEARNLEY Trustee 11 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/08/2019 30/08/2020 30/08/2021 30/08/2022 30/08/2023
Total gross income £4.48k £1.89k £719 £578 £499
Total expenditure £5.43k £1.17k £123 £478 £3.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2022 16 August 2023 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2021 05 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 05 April 2022 279 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 15 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Archbishop Beck Catholic College
55 Long Lane
Walton
LIVERPOOL
L9 7BF
Phone:
0151 525 6326
Website:

Archbishop Beck PTA