BACHCHOKA GHAR NASWADI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WHEELCHAIRS AND BICYCLES FOR THE SAID PERSONS. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 27 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YAKUB VALI PATEL | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
NAZIR PATEL | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHSINBHAI ISMAILBHAI MEWASWALA | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.25k | £49.05k | £47.27k | £38.61k | £42.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.07k | £50.32k | £41.56k | £34.32k | £38.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PEACE AND BLESSINGS BE UPON HIM) AS INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAAH SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS AND TRAINING CENTRES; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, WHEELCHAIRS AND BICYCLES FOR THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 BONSALL STREET
LEICESTER
LE5 5AD
- Phone:
- 07956119044
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window