Financial history NORTHUMBRIA STUDENTS' UNION

Charity Number: 1174053
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £4.00m £3.42m £4.07m £4.30m £4.15m
Total expenditure £3.89m £3.51m £4.11m £4.18m £4.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £453.39k £27.02k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.89m £3.15m £2.77m £2.85m £2.96m
Income - Other trading activities £62.88k £5.09k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £224.69k £1.30m £1.39m £1.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £28.59k £40.87k £11.20k £62.36k £63.55k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.81m £3.49m £4.11m £4.18m £4.07m
Expenditure - Raising funds £79.43k £13.71k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.40k £10.20k £6.14k £8.71k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0