Financial history DARNALL FA LIMITED

Charity number: 1176460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2020 27/02/2021 27/02/2022 27/02/2023 27/02/2024
Total gross income £29.02k £29.70k £65.96k £188.56k £263.50k
Total expenditure £23.41k £25.23k £72.62k £166.98k £211.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.90k £10.95k £19.79k N/A £13.83k