DARNALL FA LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To advance in life and help young people by providing support activities and education which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. (a) promoting knowledge and mutual understanding between different racial groups; (b) provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 February 2024
Total income includes £13,832 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 December 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kabier Aslam | Chair | 17 February 2015 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Ashfaq Khan | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUJAD ANWAR | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/02/2020 | 27/02/2021 | 27/02/2022 | 27/02/2023 | 27/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.02k | £29.70k | £65.96k | £188.56k | £263.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.41k | £25.23k | £72.62k | £166.98k | £211.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.90k | £10.95k | £19.79k | N/A | £13.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2024 | 25 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2024 | 25 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2023 | 02 May 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | 10 January 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | 10 January 2022 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 February 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
1) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SHEFFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3) THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; (C) WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Darnall FA
Acres Hill Lane
SHEFFIELD
S9 4LR
- Phone:
- 07774485300
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window