LEEDS BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LBKA activities further the craft of beekeeping and raise public awareness of bees in the environment, achieved by regular meetings, an education programme, attending local science and countryside shows, providing educational talks/demonstrations to schools, gardening groups, and other local groups. Also collect swarms and maintain an observation hive open to the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leeds City
Governance
- 30 October 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare McGettigan | Chair | 25 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Michelle Masters | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andy Gowdy | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lowry | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Fox | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Thomas Elliott | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Angela Lydia Utley | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES HEBDEN | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE MARGARET GRAHAM | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.73k | £10.84k | £39.56k | £43.88k | £55.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.31k | £10.51k | £33.71k | £35.22k | £45.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 30 Oct 2017 as amended on 05 Nov 2018 as amended on 16 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF LBKA ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING IN LEEDS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA; 2) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND RAISE AWARENESS OF THE IMPORTANCE OF BEES AND BEEKEEPING TO THE ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyebarn
8 The Grange
Flaxby
Knaresborough
North Yorkshire
- Phone:
- 07770615995
- Email:
- leedsbeekeeping@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window