Accounts and annual returns MALDON REFUGEE RESPONSE GROUP

Charity number: 1176107
Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 464 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 829 days
Annual return 01 April 2021 27 April 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1194 days
Annual return 01 April 2020 27 April 2022 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 27 April 2022 450 days late Download Open in new window