ACTIS ACTS CIO

Charity number: 1176455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The foundation provides grants to support for Charitable activities linked to Actis investee companies; Partnerships with charities operating in Actis countries; and Local charities nominated by Actis offices.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £160,876
Total expenditure: £138,241

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Brazil
  • China
  • Egypt
  • India
  • Kenya
  • Mauritius
  • Mexico
  • Morocco
  • Nigeria
  • Singapore
  • South Africa
  • Tunisia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 December 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Davi Carvalho Mota Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Natalie Kolbe Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Brian Chinappi Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
James Murray Grant Trustee 16 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £176.33k £226.82k £0 £165.92k £160.88k
Total expenditure £225.69k £115.61k £134.48k £42.50k £138.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 April 2023 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 04 April 2023 155 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 November 2020 16 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 MORE RIVERSIDE
LONDON
SE1 2JT
Phone:
02072345000