SIKH AID FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity with general charitable purposes have a policy of giving grants to poor people for food and clothing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 18 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 June 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARJIT DEOL | Chair | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SURINDER SINGH | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MANPREET DEOL | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 18/01/2020 | 18/01/2021 | 18/01/2022 | 18/01/2023 | 18/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £143 | £150 | £150 | £150 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 18 January 2024 | 04 March 2025 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2023 | 12 December 2023 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 18 January 2020 | 17 May 2022 | 545 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 18 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE LIVING IN GREATER LONDON DISTRICT IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING FOOD AND OTHER ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED WHICH THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, AND PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND SUPPORT IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 BLACKHILLS
ESHER
KT10 9JW
- Phone:
- 07714850948
- Email:
- harjit@easyleaseuk.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window