THE POINTS FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Object of the charity is to provide grants and donations for such charitable purposes, for the public benefit, that are exclusively charitable according to the laws of England and Wales as the trustees may from time to time determine. Priorities for support include Conservation, Environmental protection,Education, Human rights, Culture, Science and Medicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 August 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN POINTS | Chair | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Yong | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Francis Sullivan | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.91k | £9.62k | £9.47k | £9.22k | £8.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.30k | £69.97k | £57.23k | £44.50k | £47.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 PORTLAND ROAD
LONDON
W11 4LG
- Phone:
- 02077929261
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window