YMCA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ACHIEVE THESE OBJECTIVES THE Y.M.C.A. WILL PROVIDE HIGH QUALITY PROGRAMMES IN FOUR INTEGRATED AREAS: 1. HOUSING 2. YOUNG PEOPLE 3. OUTDOOR EDUCATION 4. PHYSICAL ACTIVITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 October 2017: Standard registration
- 30 April 2021: Funds received from 250630 LYTHAM ST ANNES AND FYLDE BRANCH, YOUNG MEN'S CHRI...
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN PATERSON | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|||||
RUSSELL DAWSON | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROWLAND KIRKMAN | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY KEENAN | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.01m | £140.28k | £147.58k | £148.09k | £154.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.29k | £41.27k | £28.17k | £28.89k | £53.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.89m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £118.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £23.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
(1) TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM. (2) TO LEAD YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO FULLNESS OF LIFE IN HIM. (3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (4) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES. (5) TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. (6) TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR PERSONS OF ALL AGES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ymca
St. Albans Road
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
Lancashire
FY8 1XD
- Phone:
- 01253893928
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window