Financial history LITTLE SAINTS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1174144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £118.91k £103.13k £101.00k £111.72k £108.50k
Total expenditure £105.17k £101.79k £98.38k £113.05k £114.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k N/A N/A