Financial history DARLASTON FELLOWSHIP OF THE DISABLED

Charity Number: 510391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £187.59k £279.36k £227.87k £254.96k £275.82k
Total expenditure £148.49k £176.27k £173.35k £233.02k £248.09k
Income from government contracts £184.06k £261.07k N/A N/A £275.82k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A