ROBERT F. AND GINA GOLDHAMMER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation is a grant-maker supporting a range of charitable purposes, primarily related to the advancement of Christianity, advancement of education and the promotion of arts, culture and heritage. The Trustees propose to build and manage a garden to educate people about the Christian faith and to provide a contemplative and educative experience for people of all backgrounds and faiths.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 September 2017: Standard registration
- GOLDHAMMER GARDEN OF THE SOUL (Working name)
- ROBERT F. AND GINA GOLDHAMMER FOUNDATION (Working name)
- ROBERT F. AND GINA GOLDHAMMER MEMORIAL FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GINA GOLDHAMMER | Chair | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY FRANCIS GOSTLING | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr RICHARD MALCOLM FERMER | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81m | £19.11k | £241 | £23.75k | £83.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £289.82k | £252.28k | £61.88k | £123.40k | £157.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.81m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £233 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £289.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £180.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2017 as amended on 17 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE. THIS ARTICLE MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION. 'CHARITABLE PURPOSES' ARE DEFINED IN THE ARTICLE 15.2 AS "PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES".
Contact information
- Address:
-
WITHERS LLP
20 OLD BAILEY
LONDON
EC4M 7AN
- Phone:
- 02075976000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window