LICHFIELD FESTIVAL OF MUSIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The music festival runs competitive and non-competitive music classes on the second and third Saturday each November for adults and children in vocal, piano, choral and ensemble music categories.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 August 1980: Standard registration
- LICHFIELD COMPETITIVE MUSIC FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kenneth Graham Howcroft | Chair | 16 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Martyn Proctor | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Heather Anne Duncanson | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Cornhill | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
TAMSYN JULIA ASHTON | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clementine Rose Barton | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID CHARLES MICHAEL BARTON | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Robina Zoe Bettson | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.03k | £104 | £1 | £1.71k | £2.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.81k | £190 | £160 | £2.19k | £3.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/07/1980 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2014
Charitable objects
"TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA, AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES."
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Scotch Orchard
LICHFIELD
Staffordshire
WS13 6BZ
- Phone:
- 07546380822
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window