SEAHOUSES HOSTEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By providing a centre called the Seahouses Hostel mainly but not exclusively for the advancement of education and purposes beneficial to the community and religion; to provide a residential centre primarily for the use of young people from within the Church of England Dioceses of Newcastle and Durham and also other young people as the trustees determine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 February 2018: CIO registration
- 25 October 2018: Funds received from 1059550 SEAHOUSES HOSTEL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Ven Catherine Ann Sourbut Groves | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Graham Harris | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Scott | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Stuart MacPherson | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Joan Turnbull | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clive Smithers | Trustee | 08 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.88k | £21.17k | £63.65k | £70.04k | £103.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.37k | £48.49k | £52.84k | £81.74k | £97.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.19k | £10.00k | £10.67k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CENTRE CALLED THE SEAHOUSES HOSTEL MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AND RELIGION BY ANY OR ALL OF THE MEANS STATED IN THESE OBJECTS. (CIO CONSTITUTION)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seahouses Hostel
157 Main Street
Seahouses
Northumberland
NE68 1TU
- Phone:
- 07531305206
- Email:
- seahouseshostel@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window